Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB367 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

                    By: Bernal, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 367
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 17, 2017, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 1, 1 present not voting; May 17, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 367 By:  Rodríguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to donation and distribution of surplus food at public
 schools and grace period policies for public school students with
 insufficient balances on prepaid meal cards.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act shall be known as the Student Fairness
 in Feeding Act.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 33, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 33.907 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.907.  DONATION OF FOOD. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Donate" has the meaning assigned by Section
 76.001, Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
 (2)  "Nonprofit organization" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 76.001, Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
 (b)  A school district or open-enrollment charter school may
 allow a campus to elect to donate food to a nonprofit organization
 through an official of the nonprofit organization who is directly
 affiliated with the campus, including a teacher, counselor, or
 parent of a student enrolled at the campus. The donated food may be
 received, stored, and distributed on the campus. Food donated by
 the campus may include:
 (1)  surplus food prepared for breakfast, lunch, or
 dinner meals or a snack to be served at the campus cafeteria,
 subject to any applicable local, state, and federal requirements;
 or
 (2)  food donated to the campus as the result of a food
 drive or similar event.
 (c)  The type of food donated under this section may include:
 (1)  packaged or unpackaged unserved food;
 (2)  packaged served food if the packaging is in good
 condition;
 (3)  whole, uncut produce;
 (4)  wrapped raw produce; and
 (5)  unpeeled fruit required to be peeled before
 consumption.
 (d)  Food donated under this section to a nonprofit
 organization may be distributed at the campus at any time. Campus
 employees may assist in preparing and distributing the food as
 volunteers for the nonprofit organization.
 (e)  The commissioner may adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 3.  Section 33.908, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 33.908.  GRACE PERIOD POLICY FOR EXHAUSTED OR
 INSUFFICIENT MEAL CARD OR ACCOUNT BALANCE. (a) In this section,
 "regular meal" means a meal for which a school district ordinarily
 receives reimbursement under the national free or reduced-price
 lunch program established under 42 U.S.C. Section 1751 et seq.
 (b)  A school district that allows students to use a prepaid
 meal card or account to purchase meals served at the school shall
 adopt a grace period policy regarding the use of the cards or
 accounts. The policy:
 (1)  must allow a student whose meal card or account
 balance is exhausted or insufficient to continue, for a grace
 period determined by the board of trustees of the district, to
 purchase regular meals by:
 (A)  accumulating a negative balance on the
 student's card or account; or
 (B)  otherwise receiving an extension of credit
 from the district;
 (2)  must require the district to make at least one
 attempt by telephone or e-mail during each week of the grace period
 to privately:
 (A)  notify the parent of or person standing in
 parental relation to the student that the student's meal card or
 account balance is exhausted;
 (B)  make arrangements with the parent or other
 person for payment of negative balances or amounts otherwise due,
 including through use of a payment plan; and
 (C)  assist the parent or other person in
 completing an application on behalf of the student for free or
 reduced-price meals, if it is determined that the student may be
 eligible for free or reduced-price meals;
 (3)  must require the district to provide the parent or
 other person with a written notice of a negative balance or other
 amount due that includes information on how to obtain an
 application for free or reduced-price meals;
 (4)  may not permit the district to charge a fee or
 interest in connection with meals purchased under Subdivision (1);
 and
 (5) [(4)]  may permit the district to set a schedule
 for repayment on the account balance or other amount due if the
 district is unable to set a repayment schedule by agreement through
 efforts required under Subdivision (2) [as part of the notice to the
 parent or person standing in parental relation to the student].
 (c)  After expiration of the grace period, the school
 district may:
 (1)  permit the student to continue to purchase regular
 meals in the manner described by Subsection (b)(1); or
 (2)  provide the student with alternate meals at no
 cost.
 (d)  A school district that elects to provide alternate meals
 must:
 (1)  privately notify the student's parent or person
 standing in parental relation to the student of the district's
 action; and
 (2)  provide those meals through the same serving line
 as regular meals.
 (e)  If a school district provides regular meals to a student
 under Subsection (c)(1) and is unable at the end of the school year
 to obtain payment for the meals from the student's parent or person
 standing in parental relation to the student, the district may pay
 the negative balance on the student's meal card or account using
 private donations solicited by the district from individuals and
 entities for that purpose and maintained in a separate district
 account. The amount of any private donations received under this
 subsection is in addition to any reimbursement to which the
 district is entitled under federal law.
 (f)  A school district may not publicly identify a student
 with a negative balance on a meal card or account and must implement
 any action authorized under this section in a manner that protects
 the student's privacy. The district's policy must identify the
 manner in which the district will protect the student's privacy.
 SECTION 4.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *