Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3714 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/09/2017

                    85R12997 TJB-D
 By: Hinojosa H.B. No. 3714


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a franchise tax credit pilot program for taxable
 entities that contribute to an employee dependent care flexible
 spending account.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 171, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter P to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER P. TAX CREDIT PILOT PROGRAM FOR EMPLOYER CONTRIBUTIONS
 TO DEPENDENT CARE FLEXIBLE SPENDING ACCOUNTS
 Sec. 171.801.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "dependent
 care flexible spending account" means a pre-tax benefit account
 used to pay eligible dependent care services as authorized by the
 Internal Revenue Code of 1986, as effective on January 1, 2017.
 Sec. 171.802.  ENTITLEMENT TO CREDIT. A taxable entity is
 entitled to a credit in the amount and under the conditions provided
 by this subchapter against the tax imposed under this chapter.
 Sec. 171.803.  QUALIFICATION. A taxable entity with not
 more than 500 employees qualifies for a credit under this
 subchapter for contributions made to the dependent care flexible
 spending account of each employee of the taxable entity who
 receives from the taxable entity an annual salary or wage of not
 more than $65,000.
 Sec. 171.804.  AMOUNT OF CREDIT; LIMITATIONS.  (a)  Subject
 to Subsection (b), the amount of the credit for a report in
 connection with each employee described by Section 171.803 is equal
 to the lesser of:
 (1)  50 percent of the contributions made by the
 taxable entity to the employee's dependent care flexible spending
 account; or
 (2)  $2,500.
 (b)  The total amount of the credit for each report is equal
 to the lesser of:
 (1)  the total of the credits allowed under Subsection
 (a) for the reporting period for all employees; or
 (2)  the amount of franchise tax due after applying all
 other applicable credits.
 Sec. 171.805.  APPLICATION FOR CREDIT. (a)  A taxable entity
 must apply for a credit under this subchapter on or with the tax
 report for the period for which the credit is claimed.
 (b)  The comptroller shall promulgate a form for the
 application for the credit. A taxable entity must use the form in
 applying for the credit.
 Sec. 171.806.  PERIOD FOR WHICH CREDIT MAY BE CLAIMED. A
 taxable entity may claim a credit under this subchapter for a report
 only in connection with contributions made during the accounting
 period on which the report is based.
 Sec. 171.807.  EXPIRATION.  This subchapter expires December
 31, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than September 1, 2020, the
 comptroller shall prepare and deliver to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and the presiding officer of each legislative standing committee
 with primary jurisdiction over taxation a report that evaluates the
 effect of the pilot program established under Subchapter P, Chapter
 171, Tax Code, as added by this Act, on employer contributions to
 employees' dependent care flexible spending accounts for which
 credits are granted under the pilot program under that subchapter.
 The report must include a recommendation regarding whether the
 credit allowed under the pilot program should be reestablished.
 (b)  A taxable entity that claims a credit under Subchapter
 P, Chapter 171, Tax Code, as added by this Act, shall provide to the
 comptroller information the comptroller requests to prepare the
 report described by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 3.  A taxable entity may claim the credit under
 Subchapter P, Chapter 171, Tax Code, as added by this Act, only for
 contributions made on or after September 1, 2017, and only on a
 franchise tax report originally due under Chapter 171, Tax Code, on
 or after January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.