Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB377 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2017

                    By: Oliverson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 377
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 30, 2017;
 April 6, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates to surviving
 spouses of certain military veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.302, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (a-1) and amending Subsection (b) to read as
 follows:
 (a-1)  The surviving spouse of a person who would be eligible
 for a specialty license plate under Section 504.308, 504.310,
 504.315, 504.316, or 504.319 is entitled to register one vehicle
 under the applicable section as long as the spouse remains
 unmarried.
 (b)  An applicant [for registration] under this section must
 submit proof of the eligibility of the applicant's deceased spouse
 for the applicable specialty license plate.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *