Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3808 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2017

                    By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 3808
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to student loan repayment assistance for certain mental
 health professionals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.601, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 61.601.  DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "mental
 health professional" means:
 (1)  a licensed physician who is:
 (A)  a graduate of an accredited psychiatric
 residency training program; or
 (B)  certified in psychiatry by:
 (i)  the American Board of Psychiatry and
 Neurology; or
 (ii)  the American Osteopathic Board of
 Neurology and Psychiatry;
 (2)  a psychologist, as defined by Section 501.002,
 Occupations Code;
 (3)  a licensed professional counselor, as defined by
 Section 503.002, Occupations Code;
 (4)  an advanced practice registered nurse, as defined
 by Section 301.152, Occupations Code, who holds a nationally
 recognized board certification in psychiatric or mental health
 nursing; [and]
 (5)  a licensed clinical social worker, as defined by
 Section 505.002, Occupations Code; and
 (6)  a licensed marriage and family therapist, as
 defined by Section 502.002, Occupations Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.607(b), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  The total amount of repayment assistance received by a
 mental health professional under this subchapter may not exceed:
 (1)  $160,000, for assistance received by a licensed
 physician;
 (2)  $80,000, for assistance received by:
 (A)  a psychologist;
 (B)  a licensed clinical social worker, if the
 social worker has received a doctoral degree related to social
 work; [or]
 (C)  a licensed professional counselor, if the
 counselor has received a doctoral degree related to counseling; or
 (D)  a licensed marriage and family therapist, if
 the marriage and family therapist has received a doctoral degree
 related to marriage and family therapy;
 (3)  $60,000, for assistance received by an advanced
 practice registered nurse; and
 (4)  $40,000, for assistance received by a licensed
 clinical social worker, a licensed marriage and family therapist,
 or a licensed professional counselor who is not described by
 Subdivision (2).
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *