Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

                    By: Burkett, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 4
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 6, 2017;
 March 28, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 17, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2;
 May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to monetary assistance provided by the Department of
 Family and Protective Services to certain relative or designated
 caregivers; creating a criminal offense; creating a civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 264.755, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), and (c) and adding Subsections
 (b-1), (b-2), and (f) to read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall, subject to the availability of
 funds, enter into a caregiver assistance agreement with each
 relative or other designated caregiver to provide monetary
 assistance and additional support services to the caregiver. The
 monetary assistance and support services shall be based on a
 family's need, as determined by Subsection (b) and rules adopted by
 the executive commissioner.
 (b)  The department shall provide monetary [Monetary]
 assistance [provided] under this section to a caregiver who has a
 family income that is less than or equal to 300 percent of the
 federal poverty level. Monetary assistance provided to a caregiver
 under this section may not exceed 50 percent of the department's
 daily basic foster care rate for the child. A caregiver who has a
 family income greater than 300 percent of the federal poverty level
 is not eligible for monetary assistance under this section [must
 include a one-time cash payment to the caregiver on the initial
 placement of a child or a sibling group. The amount of the cash
 payment, as determined by the department, may not exceed $1,000 for
 each child. The payment for placement of a sibling group must be at
 least $1,000 for the group, but may not exceed $1,000 for each child
 in the group. The cash payment must be provided on the initial
 placement of each child with the caregiver and is provided to assist
 the caregiver in purchasing essential child-care items such as
 furniture and clothing].
 (b-1)  The department shall disburse monetary assistance
 provided to a caregiver under Subsection (b) in the same manner as
 the department disburses payments to a foster parent.
 (b-2)  The department shall implement a process to verify the
 family income of a relative or other designated caregiver for the
 purpose of determining eligibility to receive monetary assistance
 under Subsection (b).
 (c)  Monetary assistance and additional support services
 provided under this section may include:
 (1)  case management services and training and
 information about the child's needs until the caregiver is
 appointed permanent managing conservator;
 (2)  referrals to appropriate state agencies
 administering public benefits or assistance programs for which the
 child, the caregiver, or the caregiver's family may qualify;
 (3)  family counseling not provided under the Medicaid
 program for the caregiver's family for a period not to exceed two
 years from the date of initial placement;
 (4)  if the caregiver meets the eligibility criteria
 determined by rules adopted by the executive commissioner,
 reimbursement of all child-care expenses incurred while the child
 is under 13 years of age, or under 18 years of age if the child has a
 developmental disability, and while the department is the child's
 managing conservator; and
 (5)  if the caregiver meets the eligibility criteria
 determined by rules adopted by the executive commissioner,
 reimbursement of 50 percent of child-care expenses incurred after
 the caregiver is appointed permanent managing conservator of the
 child while the child is under 13 years of age, or under 18 years of
 age if the child has a developmental disability[; and
 [(6)     reimbursement of other expenses, as determined by
 rules adopted by the executive commissioner, not to exceed $500 per
 year for each child].
 (f)  If a person who has a family income that is less than or
 equal to 300 percent of the federal poverty level enters into a
 caregiver assistance agreement with the department, obtains
 permanent managing conservatorship of a child, and meets all other
 eligibility requirements, the person may receive an annual
 reimbursement of other expenses for the child, as determined by
 rules adopted by the executive commissioner, not to exceed $500 per
 year until the earlier of:
 (1)  the third anniversary of the date the person was
 awarded permanent managing conservatorship of the child; or
 (2)  the child's 18th birthday.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter I, Chapter 264, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 264.7551 to read as follows:
 Sec. 264.7551.  FRAUDULENT AGREEMENT; CRIMINAL OFFENSE;
 CIVIL PENALTY.  (a) A person commits an offense if, with intent to
 defraud or deceive the department, the person knowingly makes or
 causes to be made a false statement or misrepresentation of a
 material fact that allows a person to enter into a caregiver
 assistance agreement.
 (b)  An offense under Subsection (a) is a state jail felony
 unless it is shown on the trial of the offense that the person has
 previously been convicted under this section, in which case the
 offense is a felony of the third degree.
 (c)  If conduct that constitutes an offense under this
 section also constitutes an offense under any other law, the actor
 may be prosecuted under this section, the other law, or both.
 (d)  The appropriate county prosecuting attorney shall be
 responsible for the prosecution of an offense under this section.
 (e)  A person who engaged in conduct described by Subsection
 (a) is liable to the state for a civil penalty of $1,000. The
 attorney general shall bring an action to recover a civil penalty as
 authorized by this subsection.
 (f)  The commissioner of the department may adopt rules
 necessary to determine whether fraudulent activity that violates
 Subsection (a) has occurred.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, Section 264.755, Family Code, as amended by this Act,
 applies to a caregiver assistance agreement entered into before,
 on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 (b)  If a person who has a family income that is less than or
 equal to 300 percent of the federal poverty level entered into a
 caregiver assistance agreement with the Department of Family and
 Protective Services on or after June 1, 2017, but before the
 effective date of this Act, and received monetary assistance under
 the agreement from the department, the department shall consider
 the money paid to the person to be a credit against the disbursement
 of caregiver assistance funds, and may not begin disbursing money
 to the person as authorized by Section 264.755, Family Code, as
 amended by this Act, until the credit has been offset.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect only if a specific
 appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
 general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.  If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for the purpose
 of implementing this Act, this Act has no effect.
 SECTION 5.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *