Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4038 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2017

                    By: Bohac (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 4038
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of "qualifying job" for purposes of
 certification by the comptroller of public accounts as a qualifying
 data center.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 151.359(a)(5), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (5)  "Qualifying job" means a full-time, permanent job
 that pays at least 120 percent of the county average weekly wage in
 the county in which the job is based. The term includes a new
 employment position staffed by a third-party employer if a written
 contract exists between the third-party employer and a qualifying
 owner, qualifying operator, or qualifying occupant that provides
 that the employment position is permanently assigned to an
 associated qualifying data center.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to a
 data center certified as a qualifying data center by the
 comptroller of public accounts, regardless of whether the
 certification occurred before, on, or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *