Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB409 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2017

                    By: Springer (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 409
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 3, 2017;
 April 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Farm-to-Market Road
 1810 in Jack County as the Luther G. Prunty Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.123.  LUTHER G. PRUNTY MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a)  The
 portion of Farm-to-Market Road 1810 in Jack County beginning at its
 intersection with State Highway 59 to the eastern boundary of Jack
 County is designated as the Luther G. Prunty Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Luther G. Prunty Memorial Highway and any other
 appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *