Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4102 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

                    H.B. No. 4102


 AN ACT
 relating to establishing and funding a grant program for testing
 evidence collected in relation to sexual assaults or other sex
 offenses; authorizing voluntary contributions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 502.414 to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.414.  VOLUNTARY CONTRIBUTION FOR EVIDENCE TESTING
 GRANT PROGRAM. (a)  When a person registers or renews the
 registration of a motor vehicle under this chapter, the person may
 contribute any amount to the evidence testing grant program
 established under Section 772.00715, Government Code.
 (b)  The department shall provide, in a conspicuous manner,
 an opportunity to contribute to the evidence testing grant program
 in any registration renewal system used by the department.
 (c)  If a person makes a contribution under this section and
 does not pay the full amount of a registration fee, the county
 assessor-collector may credit all or a portion of the contribution
 to the person's registration fee.
 (d)  The county assessor-collector shall send any
 contribution made under this section to the comptroller for deposit
 to the credit of the evidence testing account established under
 Section 772.00716, Government Code, at least once every three
 months. Before sending the money to the comptroller, the
 department may deduct money equal to the amount of reasonable
 expenses for administering this section.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 502.415 to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.415.  VOLUNTARY CONTRIBUTION TO ENDING
 HOMELESSNESS FUND. (a) When a person registers or renews the
 registration of a motor vehicle under this chapter, the person may
 contribute any amount to the Ending Homelessness fund under
 Subsection (f).
 (b)  The department shall provide, in a conspicuous manner,
 an opportunity to contribute to the Ending Homelessness fund in any
 registration renewal system used by the department.
 (c)  If a person makes a contribution under this section and
 does not pay the full amount of a registration fee, the county
 assessor-collector may credit all or a portion of the contribution
 to the person's registration fee.
 (d)  The county assessor-collector shall send any
 contribution made under this section to the comptroller for deposit
 to the Ending Homelessness fund before the 31st day after the date
 the contribution is made.
 (e)  The department shall consult with the Texas Department
 of Housing and Community Affairs in performing the department's
 duties under this section.
 (f)  The Ending Homelessness fund is created as a trust fund
 outside the state treasury to be held by the comptroller and
 administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs as trustee. The fund is composed of money deposited to the
 credit of the fund under this section. Money in the fund shall be
 used to provide grants to counties and municipalities to combat
 homelessness.
 (g)  The Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs
 shall adopt rules governing application for grants from the Ending
 Homelessness fund and the issuance of those grants.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter A, Chapter 772, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 772.00715 and 772.00716 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 772.00715.  EVIDENCE TESTING GRANT PROGRAM. (a) In
 this section:
 (1)  "Accredited crime laboratory" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 420.003.
 (2)  "Criminal justice division" means the criminal
 justice division established under Section 772.006.
 (3)  "Grant program" means the evidence testing grant
 program established under this section.
 (4)  "Law enforcement agency" means:
 (A)  the police department of a municipality;
 (B)  the sheriff's office of a county; or
 (C)  a constable's office of a county.
 (b)  The criminal justice division shall establish and
 administer a grant program and shall disburse funds to assist law
 enforcement agencies or counties in testing evidence collected in
 relation to a sexual assault or other sex offense.
 (c)  Grant funds may be used only for the testing by an
 accredited crime laboratory of evidence that was collected in
 relation to a sexual assault or other sex offense.
 (d)  The criminal justice division:
 (1)  may establish additional eligibility criteria for
 grant applicants; and
 (2)  shall establish:
 (A)  grant application procedures;
 (B)  guidelines relating to grant amounts; and
 (C)  criteria for evaluating grant applications.
 (e)  The criminal justice division shall include in the
 biennial report required by Section 772.006(a)(9) detailed
 reporting of the results and performance of the grant program.
 Sec. 772.00716.  EVIDENCE TESTING ACCOUNT. (a)
 The
 evidence testing account is created as a dedicated account in the
 general revenue fund of the state treasury.
 (b)  Money in the account may be appropriated only to the
 criminal justice division established under Section 772.006 for
 purposes of the evidence testing grant program established under
 Section 772.00715.
 (c)  Funds distributed under Section 772.00715 are subject
 to audit by the comptroller.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4102 was passed by the House on May 6,
 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 1, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 4102 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 4,
 2 present, not voting, and that the House adopted H.C.R. No. 159
 authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 4102 on May 28, 2017, by
 the following vote: Yeas 126, Nays 11, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 4102 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0, and that the Senate adopted H.C.R. No. 159 authorizing certain
 corrections in H.B. No. 4102 on May 29, 2017, by the following vote:
 Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor