Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4114 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/23/2017

                    By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 4114
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 22, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 23, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 23, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to county approval for the locations at which a junkyard or
 automotive wrecking and salvage yard may be operated.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 396.041(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  An ordinance may:
 (1)  impose a fee of $25 for the issuance or renewal of
 a license;
 (2)  impose a fee of not more than:
 (A)  $150 for the issuance or renewal of a
 license, if the ordinance is adopted by the commissioners court of a
 county with a population of one million or more that contains two or
 more municipalities, each of which has a population of 250,000 or
 more; or
 (B)  $500 for the issuance or renewal of a
 license, if the ordinance is adopted by the commissioners court of a
 county with a population of 3.3 million or more;
 (3)  condition the license on the operation of the
 junkyard or automotive wrecking and salvage yard only at a location
 approved by the commissioners court or a county employee designated
 by the commissioners court; or
 (4)  establish grounds for suspending or revoking a
 license if the junkyard or automotive wrecking and salvage yard is
 not screened.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *