Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4195 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/10/2017

                    85R12094 GRM-D
 By: Johnson of Dallas H.B. No. 4195


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing a pilot program to assist small business
 in obtaining capital.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 481, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter CC to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER CC. SMALL BUSINESS CAPITAL ACCESS PILOT PROGRAM
 Sec. 481.451.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Capital access fund" means the fund described by
 Section 481.402.
 (2)  "Capital access loan," "loan," and "small
 business" have the meanings assigned by Section 481.401.
 (3)  "Community development financial institution" has
 the meaning assigned by 12 U.S.C. Section 4702.
 (4)  "Disadvantaged individual" means a person whose
 annual income is equal to or less than $37,000.
 (5)  "Program" means the small business capital access
 pilot program established under this subchapter.
 (6)  "Rural" means a community located in a county with
 a population of 50,000 or less.
 Sec. 481.452.  REQUEST FOR PROPOSALS. Not later than
 October 1, 2017, the bank shall issue a request for proposals from
 community development financial institutions based in this state to
 administer the program. The bank shall select a community
 development financial institution to administer the program not
 later than December 1, 2018.
 Sec. 481.453.   PROGRAM FUNDING; PURPOSE. (a) The program
 shall be funded by allocating not more than 20 percent of the
 balance of the capital access fund for the purposes of the program.
 (b)  The program shall expand access to capital for small
 businesses located in this state.
 Sec. 481.454.  PROGRAM ADMINISTRATION. (a) The community
 development financial institution administering the program shall
 provide capital access loans to small businesses that face barriers
 in accessing capital. The institution administering the program
 shall give special emphasis to small businesses that are owned by:
 (1)  disadvantaged individuals;
 (2)  minorities;
 (3)  persons who reside in rural areas;
 (4)  veterans; or
 (5)  women.
 (b)  The maximum forgiveness rate is 30 percent for loans
 less than or equal to $50,000.
 Sec. 481.455.  OVERSIGHT. (a) The community development
 financial institution administering the program shall report
 monthly to the bank:
 (1)  the names of businesses that have received capital
 access loans;
 (2)  the current balance of all outstanding loans made
 under the program; and
 (3)  any other information the bank requires.
 (b)  The community development financial institution
 administering the program shall prepare a detailed financial
 statement each quarter.
 (c)  The community development financial institution shall
 allow the bank to inspect the institution's financial records on
 request.
 Sec. 481.456.  PROGRAM REPORT. The bank shall issue an
 annual status report on the program, including preliminary or final
 findings concerning the program's effectiveness. The bank shall
 deliver its report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house, and the standing committees of the
 legislature with primary jurisdiction for small business and
 economic development.
 Sec. 481.457.  EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires
 September 1, 2020.
 SECTION 2.  Section 481.402, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  To carry out the purposes of this subchapter, money in
 the fund may be appropriated for a loan made under Subchapter CC, as
 provided by Section 481.453. This subsection expires September 1,
 2020.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.