Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4279 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/12/2017

                    By: King of Uvalde (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 4279
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 12, 2017, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to expansion of the territory of the Frio Hospital
 District and to the election of the board of directors of the
 district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1030.004, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1030.004.  DISTRICT TERRITORY. Unless the district's
 boundaries are expanded under Subchapter H, the [The] boundaries of
 the district are coextensive with the boundaries of Frio County,
 Texas, except that a portion of the southern boundary follows the
 boundary of the Frio River beginning at the intersection of the
 south county line and the Frio River to the point at which the
 boundary intersects the Leona River and follows the Leona River to
 the west county line.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 1030.051(a) and (b), Special District
 Local Laws Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Unless the district's boundaries are expanded under
 Subchapter H, the [The] district is governed by a board of seven
 directors.
 (b)  Unless the district's boundaries are expanded under
 Subchapter H:
 (1)  two [Two] directors are elected from each
 commissioners precinct and one director is elected from the
 district at large; and
 (2)  the [. The] portion of Precinct 4 that is in the
 district is combined with Precinct 1 to represent one precinct.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1030.052, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1030.052.  NOTICE OF ELECTION. Notice [At least 35 days
 before the date] of an election of directors[, notice of the
 election] shall be published in accordance with Section 4.003,
 Election Code [one time in a newspaper with general circulation in
 the district].
 SECTION 4.  Section 1030.053, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1030.053.  BALLOT APPLICATION [PETITION]. A person who
 wants to have the person's name printed on the ballot as a candidate
 for director must file with the board secretary an application in
 accordance with Chapter 144, Election Code [a petition requesting
 that action. The petition must:
 [(1)     be signed by at least 10 registered voters of the
 district as determined by the most recent official list of
 registered voters;
 [(2)     be filed not later than the 31st day before the
 date of the election; and
 [(3)     specify the commissioners precinct the candidate
 wants to represent or specify that the candidate wants to represent
 the district at large].
 SECTION 5.  Chapter 1030, Special District Local Laws Code,
 is amended by adding Subchapter H to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER H. EXPANSION OF TERRITORY TO INCLUDE ALL OF FRIO COUNTY
 Sec. 1030.351.  PETITION TO EXPAND DISTRICT TERRITORY. (a)
 Registered voters of a defined territory composed of all territory
 within Frio County that does not include the territory of the
 district may file a petition with the board secretary requesting
 inclusion of the territory in the district.
 (b)  The petition must be signed by at least 50 registered
 voters of the territory or a majority of those voters, whichever is
 less.
 Sec. 1030.352.  NOTICE OF HEARING. (a) The board by order
 shall set a time and place to hold a hearing on the petition
 described by Section 1030.351.
 (b)  The hearing may not be held earlier than the 31st day
 after the date the board issues the order.
 Sec. 1030.353.  ORDER OF ANNEXATION. (a) If, after the
 hearing, the board finds that annexation of the territory into the
 district would be feasible and would benefit the district, the
 board may approve the annexation by a resolution entered in its
 minutes.
 (b)  The board is not required to include all of the
 territory described in the petition if the board finds that a change
 is necessary or desirable.
 Sec. 1030.354.  RATIFICATION ELECTION. (a) Annexation of
 territory is final when approved by a majority of the voters at:
 (1)  an election held in the district; and
 (2)  a separate election held on the same date in the
 territory to be annexed.
 (b)  If the district has outstanding debts or taxes, the
 voters in the elections to approve annexation must also determine
 whether the annexed territory will assume its portion of the debts
 or taxes on annexation.
 Sec. 1030.355.  BALLOT. The ballot for the elections shall
 be printed to permit voting for or against the following, as
 applicable:
 (1)  "Adding (description of territory to be added) to
 the Frio Hospital District."
 (2)  "(Description of territory to be added) assuming
 its proportionate share of the outstanding debts and taxes of the
 Frio Hospital District, if it is added to the district."
 Sec. 1030.356.  ANNEXATION ELECTION. (a) An election held
 under this subchapter to annex territory must be ordered in
 accordance with Chapter 3, Election Code.
 (b)  Notice of an election held under this subchapter to
 annex territory must be given as provided by Chapter 4, Election
 Code.
 Sec. 1030.357.  COMPOSITION AND ELECTION OF BOARD FOLLOWING
 ANNEXATION. (a) If annexation is approved, the board shall be
 governed by a board of nine directors with two directors elected
 from each commissioners precinct and one director elected at large.
 (b)  At the next regularly scheduled board meeting following
 the canvassing of the election to expand the district's territory,
 the board shall appoint two individuals who meet the qualifications
 under Section 1030.054 to serve as temporary directors representing
 Precinct 4 until the date of the next regular election of directors.
 (c)  On the date of the next regular election following the
 approval of annexation, in addition to the directors scheduled to
 be elected at that election, two directors shall be elected from
 Precinct 4.
 (d)  The two initial directors elected from Precinct 4 shall
 draw lots to determine which director shall serve a one-year term.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *