Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4284 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/12/2017

                    By: Price (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 4284
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the jurisdiction of the statutory county courts of
 Potter County in family law matters.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 25.1902(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  A county court at law in [The County Court at Law No.   2
 of] Potter County [also] has concurrent jurisdiction with the
 district court in family law cases and proceedings.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *