Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB493 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Perez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 493
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reporting requirements for the College Credit for
 Heroes program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 302.0031(g), Labor Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (g)  Not later than November 1 of each year, the commission,
 after consultation with the Texas Higher Education Coordinating
 Board, shall report to the legislature and the governor on:
 (1)  the results of any grants awarded under this
 section;
 (2)  the best practices for veterans and military
 servicemembers to achieve maximum academic or workforce education
 credit at institutions of higher education for military experience,
 education, and training obtained during military service;
 (3)  measures needed to facilitate the award of
 academic or workforce education credit by institutions of higher
 education for military experience, education, and training
 obtained during military service; [and]
 (4)  other related measures needed to facilitate the
 entry of trained, qualified veterans and military servicemembers
 into the workforce;
 (5)  the number of academic or workforce education
 semester credit hours awarded under the program and applied toward
 a degree or certification program at an institution of higher
 education during the most recent academic year, disaggregated by
 the subject area for which the credit hours are awarded; and
 (6)  the number of transfer credit hours awarded under
 the program and applied toward a degree or certification program at
 an institution of higher education during the most recent academic
 year.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 302.0031(g), Labor Code, applies beginning with the report due
 under that subsection not later than November 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2018.
 * * * * *