Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB505 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Geren, Howard, Button H.B. No. 505
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restrictions on lobbyist expenditures from certain
 political contributions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 305, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 305.029 to read as follows:
 Sec. 305.029.  EXPENDITURES FROM POLITICAL CONTRIBUTIONS
 RESTRICTED.  (a)  In this section, "political contribution,"
 "political committee," and "political expenditure" have the
 meanings assigned by Section 251.001, Election Code.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a person
 required to register under this chapter may not, at any time
 following the date the last term for which the person was elected
 ends, knowingly make or authorize, from political contributions
 accepted by the person as a candidate or officeholder, a political
 expenditure that is a political contribution to another candidate,
 officeholder, or political committee.
 (c)  This section does not prohibit a person from making a
 political contribution or political expenditure in support of the
 person's own candidacy.
 SECTION 2.  Section 305.029, Government Code, as added by
 this Act, applies to an expenditure made on or after January 8,
 2019, from funds accepted as a political contribution, regardless
 of the date the funds were accepted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 8, 2019.
 * * * * *