Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB516 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2017

                    By: Israel (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 516
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that drivers younger than a certain age
 complete and pass a driver education course.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1001.055(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall provide to each licensed or exempt
 driver education school and to each parent-taught course provider
 approved under this chapter driver education certificates or
 certificate numbers to enable the school or approved parent-taught
 course provider to print and issue department-approved driver
 education certificates to certify completion of an approved driver
 education course and satisfy the requirements of Sections 521.1601
 and 521.204(a)(2), Transportation Code [, 521.1601, Transportation
 Code, as added by Chapter 1253 (H.B. 339), Acts of the 81st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, and 521.1601, Transportation
 Code, as added by Chapter 1413 (S.B. 1317), Acts of the 81st
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2009].
 SECTION 2.  Section 521.142(d), Transportation Code, as
 amended by Chapters 1253 (H.B. 339) and 1413 (S.B. 1317), Acts of
 the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is reenacted to read
 as follows:
 (d)  If the applicant is under 25 years of age, the
 application must state whether the applicant has completed a driver
 education course required by Section 521.1601.
 SECTION 3.  Section 521.1601, Transportation Code, as added
 by Chapter 1253 (H.B. 339), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2009, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *