Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB544 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Anderson of McLennan, et al. H.B. No. 544
 (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 6, 2017;
 April 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 10, 2017, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 10, 2017, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of the rural water assistance fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 15.994(c), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  The board may use money in the fund to contract for
 outreach, financial, planning, and technical assistance to assist
 rural political subdivisions in obtaining and using financing from
 any source for a purpose described by this section [the fund].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *