Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB550 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2017

                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 550
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 17, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0, 1 present not
 voting; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to sound-producing devices on vessels.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 31.065, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.065.  SOUND-PRODUCING DEVICES. A vessel [motorboat]
 must have an efficient whistle or other sound-producing device if
 one is required by the commandant of the Coast Guard.
 SECTION 2.  Section 31.073(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  All canoes, kayaks, punts, rowboats, sailboats, rubber
 rafts, and other paddle craft when paddled, poled, oared, or
 windblown are exempt from all safety equipment requirements except
 each vessel must have the following:
 (1)  one Coast Guard approved wearable personal
 flotation device for each person aboard; [and]
 (2)  the lights prescribed by the commandant of the
 Coast Guard for vessels and required under Section 31.064; and
 (3)  the sound-producing device prescribed by the
 commandant of the Coast Guard for vessels and required under
 Section 31.065.
 SECTION 3.  Section 31.127(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person who violates or fails to comply with any
 provision of this chapter other than Section 31.073(a)(3), or who
 violates or fails to comply with a proclamation of the commission
 entered under this chapter or a city ordinance or order of a
 commissioners court or a political subdivision of the state made or
 entered under this chapter, commits an offense that is a Class C
 Parks and Wildlife Code misdemeanor.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *