Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB588 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            May 1, 2017      TO: Honorable Dan Huberty, Chair, House Committee on Public Education      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB588 by Bohac (Relating to the establishment of a grant program for promoting computer science certification and professional development for public school teachers.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB588, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($210,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2019. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 1, 2017





  TO: Honorable Dan Huberty, Chair, House Committee on Public Education      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB588 by Bohac (Relating to the establishment of a grant program for promoting computer science certification and professional development for public school teachers.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Dan Huberty, Chair, House Committee on Public Education
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB588 by Bohac (Relating to the establishment of a grant program for promoting computer science certification and professional development for public school teachers.), As Introduced

 Honorable Dan Huberty, Chair, House Committee on Public Education 

 Honorable Dan Huberty, Chair, House Committee on Public Education 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB588 by Bohac (Relating to the establishment of a grant program for promoting computer science certification and professional development for public school teachers.), As Introduced

HB588 by Bohac (Relating to the establishment of a grant program for promoting computer science certification and professional development for public school teachers.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB588, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($210,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2019. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB588, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($210,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2019.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2018 ($105,000)   2019 ($105,000)   2020 ($105,000)   2021 ($105,000)   2022 ($105,000)    


2018 ($105,000)
2019 ($105,000)
2020 ($105,000)
2021 ($105,000)
2022 ($105,000)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2018 ($105,000)   2019 ($105,000)   2020 ($105,000)   2021 ($105,000)   2022 ($105,000)   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1    2018 ($105,000)   2019 ($105,000)   2020 ($105,000)   2021 ($105,000)   2022 ($105,000)  


2018 ($105,000)
2019 ($105,000)
2020 ($105,000)
2021 ($105,000)
2022 ($105,000)

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Education Code to require the Commissioner to create a grant program that encourages teachers to become computer science teachers through grants to preparation programs for certification and professional development providers for continuing education with appropriated funds. The bill would limit grant recipients to institutions of higher education (IHEs), education service centers (ESCs), independent school districts (ISDs), and nonprofits that have proven success in providing professional development in educational technology. The bill would require grant recipients to provide professional development to at least three high-need school districts, as determined by Commissioner rule, and provide training necessary to enable at least 10 teachers to receive computer science certification each year. The bill would require the Commissioner to establish the grant program by December 13, 2017.The bill would take effect immediately if passed with necessary voting margins, or September 1, 2017.

Methodology

Providing grant awards to eligible entities as specified in the bill would result in a cost of $105,000 in each fiscal year. As specified by the bill, the Texas Education Agency (TEA) estimates grant awards would be provided to three eligible entities to provide professional development to at least three high-need school districts and provide training necessary to enable at least 10 teachers to receive a computer science certification each year. TEA indicates that grants would be awarded in the late spring of 2018 for implementation in school year 2018-2019 school year and would continue for a five-year cycle to allow recipients to plan and staff appropriately. According to TEA, grant applicants would likely be entities that provide certification preparation and professional development entirely on-line or are both located in a geographical area that has access to a significant population of computer science candidates and high-needs districts.TEA estimates grants awards would total $35,000 per grantee, totaling $105,000 each fiscal year ($35,000 x 3 grantees). Each grant award would consist of $30,000 to support candidates pursuing computer science certification to subsidize a significant portion of enrollment costs. Additionally, each grantee would receive $5,000 each year to provide professional development to high-needs districts. According to TEA, this cost would cover approximately four days of face-to-face training or a year's worth of on-line training, with a training cohort size of 10 educators.This analysis estimates that TEA can use existing full-time equivalent positions for grant management and program oversight.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 701 Texas Education Agency

701 Texas Education Agency

LBB Staff: UP, THo, AM, AW

 UP, THo, AM, AW