Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB63 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/14/2016

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R2479 AJZ-D
 By: Davis of Harris H.B. No. 63


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the operations of the Cancer Prevention and Research
 Institute of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 572.003(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  The term means a member of:
 (1)  the Public Utility Commission of Texas;
 (2)  the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality;
 (3)  the Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission;
 (4)  The Finance Commission of Texas;
 (5)  the Texas Facilities Commission;
 (6)  the Texas Board of Criminal Justice;
 (7)  the board of trustees of the Employees Retirement
 System of Texas;
 (8)  the Texas Transportation Commission;
 (9)  the Texas Department of Insurance;
 (10)  the Parks and Wildlife Commission;
 (11)  the Public Safety Commission;
 (12)  the Texas Ethics Commission;
 (13)  the State Securities Board;
 (14)  the Texas Water Development Board;
 (15)  the governing board of a public senior college or
 university as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code, or of The
 University of Texas Southwestern Medical Center, The University of
 Texas Medical Branch at Galveston, The University of Texas Health
 Science Center at Houston, The University of Texas Health Science
 Center at San Antonio, The University of Texas M. D. Anderson Cancer
 Center, The University of Texas Health Science Center at Tyler,
 University of North Texas Health Science Center at Fort Worth,
 Texas Tech University Health Sciences Center, Texas State Technical
 College--Harlingen, Texas State Technical College--Marshall, Texas
 State Technical College--Sweetwater, or Texas State Technical
 College--Waco;
 (16)  the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board;
 (17)  the Texas Workforce Commission;
 (18)  the board of trustees of the Teacher Retirement
 System of Texas;
 (19)  the Credit Union Commission;
 (20)  the School Land Board;
 (21)  the board of the Texas Department of Housing and
 Community Affairs;
 (22)  the Texas Racing Commission;
 (23)  the State Board of Dental Examiners;
 (24)  the Texas Medical Board;
 (25)  the Board of Pardons and Paroles;
 (26)  the Texas State Board of Pharmacy;
 (27)  the Department of Information Resources
 governing board;
 (28)  the Motor Vehicle Board;
 (29)  the Texas Real Estate Commission;
 (30)  the board of directors of the State Bar of Texas;
 (31)  the Bond Review Board [bond review board];
 (32)  the Health and Human Services Commission;
 (33)  the Texas Funeral Service Commission;
 (34)  the board of directors of a river authority
 created under the Texas Constitution or a statute of this state;
 [or]
 (35)  the Texas Lottery Commission; or
 (36)  the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of
 Texas.
 SECTION 2.  Section 102.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 102.003.  SUNSET PROVISION. The Cancer Prevention and
 Research Institute of Texas is subject to Chapter 325, Government
 Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, the institute is abolished and this chapter
 expires September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 3.  Section 102.109, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b)(9), an oversight
 committee member, program integration committee member, or
 institute employee may represent the interests of this state by
 serving in an unpaid position on the board of directors of a grant
 recipient only after the institute has awarded the grant to the
 grant recipient.
 SECTION 4.  Section 102.203(e), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  Not more than 10 percent of the money appropriated to
 the fund by the legislature for grants in a state fiscal biennium
 [awarded under this subchapter] may be used for cancer prevention
 and control programs during any year.
 SECTION 5.  Section 102.251, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  The institute may not award a grant to an applicant who
 has on the applicant's board of directors a member of any committee
 established under this chapter or an institute employee.
 SECTION 6.  Section 102.254, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 102.254.  PERIOD FOR AWARDS. The oversight committee
 may not award money under Subchapter E [before January 1, 2008, or]
 after August 31, 2022 [2020].
 SECTION 7.  Section 102.256, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The oversight committee may transfer its management and
 disposition authority over the state's interest in royalties,
 income, and other benefits realized as a result of projects
 undertaken with money awarded under Subchapter E to the Texas
 Treasury Safekeeping Trust Company. If the oversight committee
 transfers management and disposition authority under this
 subsection, the Texas Treasury Safekeeping Trust Company has any
 power necessary to accomplish the purposes of this section.
 SECTION 8.  Subchapter F, Chapter 102, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 102.2632 to read as follows:
 Sec. 102.2632.  INVESTMENT OWNERSHIP; CLOSED SESSION. The
 oversight committee may conduct a closed meeting under Chapter 551,
 Government Code, to discuss issues related to managing, acquiring,
 or selling equity or other revenue sharing obligations created
 under Section 102.256.
 SECTION 9.  Section 102.101(f), Health and Safety Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.