Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB641 House Committee Report / Analysis

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS             H.B. 641     By: Phillips     Natural Resources     Committee Report (Unamended)             BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE    Interested parties note that almost two decades ago the states of Texas and Oklahoma entered into a compact to definitively locate the jurisdictional boundary between the two states. H.B. 641 seeks to continue this effort by extending the existence of the Red River Boundary Commission.        CRIMINAL JUSTICE IMPACT   It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly create a criminal offense, increase the punishment for an existing criminal offense or category of offenses, or change the eligibility of a person for community supervision, parole, or mandatory supervision.       RULEMAKING AUTHORITY    It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution.       ANALYSIS    H.B. 641 amends the Natural Resources Code to extend from not later than July 30, 2017, to not later than July 30, 2021, the deadline by which the Red River Boundary Commission is required to issue a final report to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and appropriate committees of the legislature. The bill changes from December 31, 2017, to December 31, 2021, the date on which statutory provisions governing the commission expire.       EFFECTIVE DATE    On passage, or, if the bill does not receive the necessary vote, September 1, 2017.        

BILL ANALYSIS

# BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

 

H.B. 641
By: Phillips
Natural Resources
Committee Report (Unamended)

H.B. 641

By: Phillips

Natural Resources

Committee Report (Unamended)

 

 

 

BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE    Interested parties note that almost two decades ago the states of Texas and Oklahoma entered into a compact to definitively locate the jurisdictional boundary between the two states. H.B. 641 seeks to continue this effort by extending the existence of the Red River Boundary Commission.
CRIMINAL JUSTICE IMPACT   It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly create a criminal offense, increase the punishment for an existing criminal offense or category of offenses, or change the eligibility of a person for community supervision, parole, or mandatory supervision.
RULEMAKING AUTHORITY    It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution.
ANALYSIS    H.B. 641 amends the Natural Resources Code to extend from not later than July 30, 2017, to not later than July 30, 2021, the deadline by which the Red River Boundary Commission is required to issue a final report to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and appropriate committees of the legislature. The bill changes from December 31, 2017, to December 31, 2021, the date on which statutory provisions governing the commission expire.
EFFECTIVE DATE    On passage, or, if the bill does not receive the necessary vote, September 1, 2017.

BACKGROUND AND PURPOSE 

 

Interested parties note that almost two decades ago the states of Texas and Oklahoma entered into a compact to definitively locate the jurisdictional boundary between the two states. H.B. 641 seeks to continue this effort by extending the existence of the Red River Boundary Commission. 

 

CRIMINAL JUSTICE IMPACT

 

It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly create a criminal offense, increase the punishment for an existing criminal offense or category of offenses, or change the eligibility of a person for community supervision, parole, or mandatory supervision.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY 

 

It is the committee's opinion that this bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, department, agency, or institution.

 

ANALYSIS 

 

H.B. 641 amends the Natural Resources Code to extend from not later than July 30, 2017, to not later than July 30, 2021, the deadline by which the Red River Boundary Commission is required to issue a final report to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and appropriate committees of the legislature. The bill changes from December 31, 2017, to December 31, 2021, the date on which statutory provisions governing the commission expire.

 

EFFECTIVE DATE 

 

On passage, or, if the bill does not receive the necessary vote, September 1, 2017.