Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB641 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 641
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 27, 2017;
 April 6, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 4, 2017, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 4, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of the Red River Boundary Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.057(b), Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Not later than July 30, 2021 [2017], the commission
 shall issue a final report to the governor, lieutenant governor,
 speaker of the house of representatives, and appropriate committees
 of the legislature.
 SECTION 2.  Section 12.058, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.058.  EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
 expires December 31, 2021 [2017].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *