Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB755 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2017

                    By: Parker (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 755
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use by certain tax-exempt organizations of certain
 payments made in connection with real property transfers to provide
 educational activities through certain schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5.202(c), Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  The benefit described by Subsection (b)(9)(C) may
 collaterally benefit:
 (1)  a community composed of:
 (A) [(1)]  property that is adjacent to the
 encumbered property; or
 (B) [(2)]  property a boundary of which is not
 more than 1,000 yards from a boundary of the encumbered property; or
 (2)  with respect to a payment to a school for
 educational activities, property not described by Subdivision (1)
 if the encumbered property is located within:
 (A)  the school's assigned attendance zone; and
 (B)  a county with a population of more than
 650,000 that is adjacent to two counties, each of which has a
 population of more than 1.8 million.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *