Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB776 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/23/2017

                    By: Ashby (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 776
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 April 26, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 23, 2017, reported favorably, as amended, by
 the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 23, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1 By:  Burton
 Amend H.B. No. 776 (house engrossed version) in SECTION 1 of
 the bill, in amended Section 572.032(a-1), Government Code (page 1,
 line 7), between "address" and "of", by inserting ", the telephone
 number, and the names of the dependent children".
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the removal of home addresses from personal financial
 statements filed by certain persons.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 572.032(a-1), Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The commission shall remove the home address of an
 individual [a judge or justice] from a financial statement filed by
 the individual under this subchapter before:
 (1)  permitting a member of the public to view the
 statement; [or]
 (2)  providing a copy of the statement to a member of
 the public; or
 (3)  making the statement available to the public on
 the commission's Internet website, if the commission makes
 statements filed under this subchapter available on its website.
 SECTION 2.  Section 572.032(a-1), Government Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies to a financial statement filed under
 Subchapter B, Chapter 572, Government Code, regardless of whether
 the statement was required to be filed before, on, or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *