Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB791 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lozano, Cain (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 791
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 April 24, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 10, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 791 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to allowing individuals appointed to state office to file
 required financial statements by certified mail.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 572.0291, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 572.0291.  ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIRED.  (a)  Except as
 provided by Subsection (b), a [A] financial statement filed with
 the commission must be filed by computer diskette, modem, or other
 means of electronic transfer, using computer software provided by
 the commission or computer software that meets commission
 specifications for a standard file format.
 (b)  An individual who was appointed to office and who is
 required to file a financial statement with the commission under
 this subchapter may file the financial statement by certified mail.
 The filing by mail must be in compliance with Section 572.029.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *