Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB811 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R26747 CAE-D
 By: King of Hemphill, Guillen, Paddie, H.B. No. 811
 Workman, et al.
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 811:
 By:  Meyer C.S.H.B. No. 811


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the extension of additional state aid for tax reduction
 provided to certain school districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.2516, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b) and (c-1) and adding Subsections (j) and
 (k) to read as follows:
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this title, but
 subject to Subsections (j) and (k), a school district that imposes a
 maintenance and operations tax at a rate at least equal to the
 product of the state compression percentage multiplied by the
 maintenance and operations tax rate adopted by the district for the
 2005 tax year is entitled to at least the amount of state revenue
 necessary to provide the district with the sum of:
 (1)  the percentage specified by Subsection (i) of the
 amount, as calculated under Subsection (e), of state and local
 revenue per student in weighted average daily attendance for
 maintenance and operations that the district would have received
 during the 2009-2010 school year under Chapter 41 and this chapter,
 as those chapters existed on January 1, 2009, at a maintenance and
 operations tax rate equal to the product of the state compression
 percentage for that year multiplied by the maintenance and
 operations tax rate adopted by the district for the 2005 tax year;
 (2)  the percentage specified by Subsection (i) of an
 amount equal to the product of $120 multiplied by the number of
 students in weighted average daily attendance in the district; and
 (3)  any amount to which the district is entitled under
 Section 42.106.
 (c-1)  Revenue generated by the portion of a district's
 maintenance and operations tax rate included in calculating the
 district's compressed tax rate under Section 42.101(a-1) and local
 share under Section 42.252(a-1) is included in determining the
 amount to which a district is entitled under this section, but may
 not increase the total amount of revenue per weighted student to
 which the district is entitled under this section.  This subsection
 expires September 1, 2019 [2017].
 (j)  If the commissioner determines that a school district
 would receive additional state aid under this section for the
 2017-2018 or 2018-2019 school year in an amount that is four percent
 or less of the total amount of funding the district is entitled to
 receive under this chapter and Chapter 41, the district is
 ineligible to receive additional state aid under this section for
 the year for which the determination is made and any subsequent
 school year. This subsection expires September 1, 2019.
 (k)  If the commissioner determines that a school district is
 not entitled to additional state aid under this section for the
 2016-2017 or a subsequent school year, the district is ineligible
 to receive additional state aid under this section for any school
 year subsequent to the year for which the determination was made.
 This subsection expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  Section 42.2518(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  For the 2015-2016 through 2018-2019 [and 2016-2017]
 school years, a school district is entitled to additional state aid
 to the extent that state and local revenue under this chapter and
 Chapter 41 is less than the state and local revenue that would have
 been available to the district under Chapter 41 and this chapter as
 those chapters existed on September 1, 2015, if the increase in the
 residence homestead exemption under Section 1-b(c), Article VIII,
 Texas Constitution, and the additional limitation on tax increases
 under Section 1-b(d) of that article as proposed by S.J.R. 1, 84th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, had not occurred.
 SECTION 3.  Effective September 1, 2019, Section 42.2518(a),
 Education Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Beginning with the 2019-2020 school year [For the
 2015-2016 and 2016-2017 school years], a school district is
 entitled to additional state aid to the extent that state and local
 revenue under this chapter and Chapter 41 is less than the state and
 local revenue that would have been available to the district under
 Chapter 41 and this chapter as those chapters existed on September
 1, 2015, excluding any state aid that would have been provided under
 former Section 42.2516, if the increase in the residence homestead
 exemption under Section 1-b(c), Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 and the additional limitation on tax increases under Section 1-b(d)
 of that article as proposed by S.J.R. 1, 84th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2015, had not occurred.
 SECTION 4.  Notwithstanding Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, the following
 provisions are effective September 1, 2019:
 (1)  Section 57.03, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended Section
 12.106(a), Education Code;
 (2)  Section 57.18, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended the heading to
 Section 42.2516, Education Code;
 (3)  Section 57.19, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended Section
 42.2516(a), Education Code;
 (4)  Section 57.23, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended Section
 42.253(h), Education Code;
 (5)  Section 57.29, Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the 82nd
 Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which amended Section
 26.08(i), Tax Code;
 (6)  Section 57.32(a), Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which repealed various
 provisions of the Education Code; and
 (7)  Section 57.32(b), Chapter 4 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, which repealed Sections
 26.08(i-1) and (j), Tax Code.
 SECTION 5.  Section 42.2518(e), Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 6.  Section 18, Chapter 465 (S.B. 1), Acts of the
 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, which added Section
 42.2518, Education Code, effective September 1, 2017, is repealed.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect only if H.B. 21, 85th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, does not become law. If H.B.
 21, 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, becomes law, this Act
 has no effect.
 SECTION 8.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
 legislative session.