Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB828 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/05/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R5589 JTS-D
 By: Blanco H.B. No. 828


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for Vietnam
 veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.312(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall issue:
 (1)  specialty license plates that include the Vietnam
 Service Medal image to a veteran:
 (A)  who served in the United States armed forces
 in the Republic of Vietnam or waters contiguous to the Republic of
 Vietnam during the period beginning on February 28, 1961, and
 ending on May 7, 1975; and
 (B)  whose United States Department of Defense
 Form DD-214 lists either the Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal
 (Vietnam) or the Vietnam Service Medal; or
 (2)  specialty license plates that include the National
 Defense Service Medal image to a veteran:
 (A)  who served in the United States armed forces
 during the period beginning on August 5, 1964, and ending on May 7,
 1975; and
 (B)  whose United States Department of Defense
 Form DD-214 lists the National Defense Service Medal but not a medal
 described by Subdivision (1) [specialty license plates for persons
 who served in the United States armed forces:
 [(1)     during the period beginning on January 1, 1961,
 and ending on August 14, 1974, and who received the National Defense
 Service Medal; or
 [(2)     in a combat zone in the Republic of Vietnam during
 the period beginning on July 1, 1958, and ending on March 28, 1973,
 and who received the Vietnam Service Medal].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.