Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB846 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Raney, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 846
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 April 19, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Veteran Affairs & Border Security; May 17, 2017, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 846 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the implementation of student financial assistance
 programs for veterans and their families.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 56, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 56.0065 to read as follows:
 Sec. 56.0065.  STUDENT FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE PROGRAMS FOR
 VETERANS AND FAMILIES; EQUAL PROTECTION.  (a)  In this section,
 "private or independent institution of higher education" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  An institution of higher education or a private or
 independent institution of higher education may not impose
 additional fees, obligations, or burdens concerning payment or
 registration on a student eligible for state or federal military
 related student financial assistance programs for military
 veterans or their family members that are not otherwise required by
 those programs to be imposed for the purpose of receiving that
 assistance.
 (c)  An institution of higher education or a private or
 independent institution of higher education must provide for a
 student described by Subsection (b) to defer payment of tuition and
 fees if the receipt of military related financial assistance
 awarded to the student is delayed by less than 60 days. The Texas
 Veterans Commission, in cooperation with institutions of higher
 education and private or independent institutions of higher
 education, shall prescribe a standard deferment request form for
 the purposes of this subsection.
 (d)  This section does not prohibit an institution of higher
 education or a private or independent institution of higher
 education from requiring a student described by Subsection (b) to
 submit a free application for federal student aid (FAFSA).
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply
 beginning with the 2017-2018 academic year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *