Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB947 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/03/2017

                    By: Thompson of Brazoria, Gonzales of Williamson H.B. No. 947
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 3, 2017;
 April 6, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 3, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Farm-to-Market Road
 1462 in Brazoria County as the Lieutenant Colonel Roy Lin Tisdale
 Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.123.  LIEUTENANT COLONEL ROY LIN TISDALE MEMORIAL
 HIGHWAY. (a) The portion of Farm-to-Market Road 1462 in Brazoria
 County between State Highway 288 and State Highway 35 is designated
 as the Lieutenant Colonel Roy Lin Tisdale Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Lieutenant Colonel Roy Lin Tisdale Memorial
 Highway and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *