Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB961 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodriguez of Bexar (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 961
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 9, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 15, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 961 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the election of junior college district trustees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 130.082, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (d-1) and (g-1) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  Except as provided by Subsection (d) or Section
 130.0827, each position on the board of trustees shall be filled by
 election in accordance with this section.
 (g-1)  The board by resolution may provide, not later than
 the 180th day before the date of an election, that a candidate must
 receive a plurality of the votes cast for a position to be filled at
 the election under Subsection (g). A resolution adopted under this
 subsection is effective for subsequent elections until rescinded by
 a subsequent resolution adopted not later than the 180th day before
 the date of the first election to which the rescission applies.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *