Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB967 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2017

                    By: VanDeaver (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 967
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 11, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 22, 2017, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers of the TexAmericas Center.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 3503.003(a), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The authority is created to:
 (1)  accept title on approval by, and in coordination
 with, the governor to all or a portion of the property on, adjacent
 to, or related to the property described by Section 3503.004 from
 the United States;
 (2)  promote the location and development of new
 businesses, industries, and commercial activities on or related to
 the property;
 (3)  undertake a project the board considers necessary
 or incidental to the industrial, commercial, or business
 development, redevelopment, maintenance, and expansion of new or
 existing businesses on and for the property described by Section
 3503.004, including the acquisition, construction, operation,
 maintenance, repair, rehabilitation, replacement, improvement,
 extension, expansion, or enhancement of:
 (A)  roads, bridges, and rights-of-way;
 (B)  housing;
 (C)  property;
 (D)  police, fire, medical, cultural,
 educational, and research services, equipment, institutions, and
 resources;
 (E)  other community support services;
 (F)  flood control, water, wastewater treatment,
 natural gas, electricity, solid waste disposal, steam generation,
 communications, and all other utility facilities and services;
 (G)  other infrastructure improvements; and
 (H)  any other services or facilities acquired by
 the authority from the United States;
 (4)  promote or support an active military base located
 in the same county as the authority to prevent closure or
 realignment of the base and attract new military missions to the
 base; [and]
 (5)  exercise the powers granted to a conservation and
 reclamation district under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas
 Constitution; and
 (6)  promote regional economic development and job
 creation inside the district's boundaries and outside of the
 district's boundaries in Bowie County and adjacent counties.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 3503, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 3503.112 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 3503.112.  NONPROFIT CORPORATIONS FOR SPECIAL
 PROJECTS. (a) The authority may authorize by resolution the
 creation of a nonprofit corporation under the Business
 Organizations Code solely to undertake on behalf of the authority a
 project described by Section 3503.003(a)(3).
 (b)  The board shall appoint the board of directors of each
 nonprofit corporation created under this section. A board member
 is not required to reside in the authority.
 (c)  A board member or employee of the authority may
 simultaneously serve as a member of the board of directors of a
 nonprofit corporation. A person serving as a board member of the
 authority and of a nonprofit corporation created under this section
 may participate in all votes relating to the business of the
 authority or the corporation.
 (d)  The nonprofit corporation may not exercise the power of
 eminent domain.
 (e)  A nonprofit corporation created under this section is
 subject to Chapters 551 and 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *