By: Murr, Moody (Senate Sponsor - RodrÃguez) H.B. No. 978 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2017; May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice; May 19, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the terms of the board members of the Texas Indigent Defense Commission. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 79.014(b), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) The board members serve staggered terms of six [two] years, with one or two members' terms expiring February 1 of each odd-numbered year [and three members' terms expiring February 1 of each even-numbered year]. SECTION 2. The members of the board of the Texas Indigent Defense Commission serving on the effective date of this Act may draw lots or use another method to determine the members who shall serve terms that expire on February 1, 2023, the members who shall serve terms that expire on February 1, 2021, and the members who shall serve terms that expire on February 1, 2019. The members of the board appointed to succeed the members serving on the effective date of this Act shall serve six-year terms. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *