Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR111 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/21/2017

                    H.C.R. No. 111


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Fort Hood is celebrating its 75th anniversary in
 2017, and this is a fitting opportunity to pay tribute to the base's
 significant role in the history of our state and nation; and
 WHEREAS, In January 1942, only weeks after the Japanese
 attack on Pearl Harbor, the U.S. Army announced that it was
 establishing a tank destroyer tactical and firing center near
 Killeen, and on April 2, 1942, the 893rd Tank Destroyer Battalion
 under the command of General Andrew D. Bruce arrived from Fort
 Meade, Maryland; named after Confederate Army General John Bell
 Hood, Camp Hood was officially opened on September 18, 1942; and
 WHEREAS, During World War II, Camp Hood's mission expanded to
 include basic training; nearly 100,000 soldiers trained for combat
 there, and in the later years of the war, approximately 4,000 German
 prisoners were interned at the camp; in 1950, it was renamed Fort
 Hood, and permanent buildings began to be constructed; and
 WHEREAS, Since 1961, Fort Hood has been home to the U.S. Army
 III Corps, and its current roster includes the 1st Cavalry Division
 and 1st Army Division West; units from Fort Hood have deployed to
 every major conflict since World War II, including Korea, Vietnam,
 Somalia, Bosnia and Herzegovina, Afghanistan, and Iraq; it also
 supports homeland security as the antiterror training ground for
 Army Reserve and National Guard units; and
 WHEREAS, Today, the "Great Place" has grown from its original
 108,000 acres to nearly 218,000 acres across the rolling hills of
 Central Texas; it serves a population of 400,000, including active
 duty troops, family members, civilian employees, defense
 contractors, retirees, and survivors of fallen soldiers, and it
 generates a statewide economic impact of $35.4 billion every year;
 it is the largest active duty armored post in the nation's military,
 home not only to members of the cavalry and the infantry, but to
 tanker personnel, engineers, mechanics, health care professionals,
 and workers in other disciplines; and
 WHEREAS, For three-quarters of a century, Fort Hood has
 played an integral part in the defense of our nation and in the
 culture and economy of the Lone Star State, and the men and women of
 Fort Hood may indeed take great pride in their myriad contributions
 as they celebrate this special occasion; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 85th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby commemorate the 75th anniversary of Fort Hood and extend to
 everyone associated with the base sincere best wishes for continued
 success in their important work.
 Shine
 Cosper
 Sheffield
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 111 was adopted by the House on
 April 6, 2017, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 111 was adopted by the Senate on
 April 11, 2017, by a viva-voce vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor