Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR115 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/23/2017

                    H.C.R. No. 115


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Current and former members of Boy Scout Troop
 No. 201 in Longview are celebrating the troop's 100th anniversary
 at a ceremony on May 6, 2017; and
 WHEREAS, One of the oldest Boy Scout troops in Texas and one
 of the oldest west of the Mississippi River, Troop No. 201 was
 chartered in Longview in March 1917, only seven years after the Boy
 Scouts of America was founded; the Longview Lions Club officially
 took over sponsorship of the troop on April 1, 1935, and the Lions
 have remained associated with the troop ever since; and
 WHEREAS, From the beginning, the troop has helped its members
 to build character by learning such important life skills as
 leadership, teamwork, discipline, and service to others; the
 Longview Scouts have also had the opportunity to enjoy such
 timeless and fun experiences as camping trips, canoeing
 expeditions, and long-distance hikes; and
 WHEREAS, On the troop's 50th anniversary in 1967, Governor
 John Connally came to Longview to help bury a time capsule near the
 Scout Hut in Teague Park, and at the 100th anniversary, that capsule
 will be unearthed and replaced with the assistance of Governor Greg
 Abbott and Gregg County District Judge David Brabham, who are both
 proud former members of Troop No. 201; and
 WHEREAS, Over the course of the past century, Boy Scout Troop
 No. 201 in Longview has enabled generations of young Texans to
 prepare themselves for the challenges and opportunities of
 adulthood, and on this special occasion, the past and present
 members of the troop may indeed take great pride in their shared
 history; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 85th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby commemorate the centennial of Boy Scout Troop No. 201 in
 Longview and extend to all those associated with the troop sincere
 best wishes for a meaningful and memorable event; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for Troop No. 201 as an expression of high regard by the
 Texas House of Representatives and Senate.
 Dean
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 115 was adopted by the House on
 April 6, 2017, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 115 was adopted by the Senate on
 April 11, 2017, by a viva-voce vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor