Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR68 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/23/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.C.R. No. 68


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The certain knowledge of a life well lived may
 comfort those saddened by the death of Will David Davis Sr., who
 passed away on December 12, 2016, at the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Houston on July 18, 1929, Will Davis was the
 son of David Davis and Nita Barnett Davis; in 1934, he moved to
 Austin with his mother, and five years later, when he was only nine,
 he became the youngest page to serve the Texas Legislature; he
 worked during three sessions to help provide for his family; and
 WHEREAS, After graduating from Austin High School, Mr. Davis
 went on to play football for Lamar University and then Baylor
 University, where he completed his bachelor's and law degrees; he
 was a member of the Baylor team that played in the 1951 Orange Bowl,
 and he won election as president of the student body; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Davis was hired as an assistant attorney
 general, and in 1957, he was appointed general counsel of the Texas
 Department of Insurance by Governor Price Daniel; three years
 later, he joined his uncle, W. W. Heath, as a partner in the firm
 that became Heath, Davis, and McCalla; in 2010, he took on the role
 of counsel to Thompson Coe, and he retired the following year; and
 WHEREAS, Over the course of his distinguished career,
 Mr. Davis represented major insurance companies, insurance holding
 companies, and insurance trade associations; he became general
 counsel for the Texas Association of Life and Health Insurers at its
 inception in 1997, having served one of its predecessor
 organizations for many years; in addition, he served as outside
 general counsel and as a member of advising boards of directors and
 management for several insurance companies; he frequently
 represented insurance company clients before the Texas
 Legislature, and as an insurance industry representative, he was
 instrumental in the drafting of laws that are now part of the Texas
 Insurance Code; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Davis was very engaged in the political arena,
 and in the 1960s, he served as chair of the Texas Democratic Party
 and of the Texas State Democratic Conventions; moreover, he was a
 delegate to both state and national conventions and served in many
 campaigns and on many gubernatorial inauguration committees; and
 WHEREAS, Because his mother had been a teacher, Mr. Davis
 felt called to support public education and professionals in the
 field through his leadership; he was a member of the Austin
 Independent School District Board of Trustees for 16 years and
 served three terms as president; in 1978, he was president of the
 National School Boards Association, and he served as an officer for
 seven years; and
 WHEREAS, At the state level, Mr. Davis was president of the
 Texas Association of School Boards; he was a member of the
 Governor's Select Committee on Public Education, which made
 recommendations for major reforms that were adopted by the
 legislature in the 1984 Special Session as House Bill 72; in
 addition, he was elected to the Texas State Board of Education and
 his tenure, which spanned more than a decade, included a term as
 vice chair; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Davis benefited higher education as well; one of
 the original seven founders of Austin Community College, he became
 inaugural president of the board of trustees in 1972, and following
 three terms, he remained a board member until 1982; during that
 time, enrollment grew to more than 20,000 students, and today, ACC
 is one of the largest community colleges in Texas; he was also chair
 of the Baylor University Board of Regents from 2004 to 2006 and
 served as a regent for almost two decades; and
 WHEREAS, The recipient of myriad accolades for his
 professional and civic accomplishments, Mr. Davis was accorded
 Baylor's Distinguished Alumni Award, the Price Daniel "Pro Texana"
 Distinguished Public Service Award, and the "Pro Texana" Award; in
 1991, AISD paid tribute to his achievements with the opening of the
 Will D. Davis Elementary School, and nine years later, the Texas
 Association of School Boards named its office the Will D. Davis
 Building; the Insurance Council of Texas presented him with its
 Raymond Mauk Award for leadership in 2010, and two years later,
 TALHI conferred on him its first Will Davis Leadership Award; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted family man, Mr. Davis shared a rewarding
 marriage of 57 years with Ann Byargeon Davis before her passing; he
 took great pride in his children, Lisa Davis, Lynn Davis Walker, and
 Will Davis Jr., as well as in his nine grandchildren, Katelyn
 Baroch, Allie Frazier, Becca Jahnke, Bill Walker III, Davis Walker,
 Natalie Betzer, Will Davis III, Emily Boone, and Sara Regan, and
 five great-grandchildren, Davis and Blake Baroch, Annaleigh
 Frazier, Mary Carson Walker, and William "Liam" A. Walker IV; he was
 a valued member of Hyde Park Baptist Church and taught young married
 couples in Sunday school for many years; and
 WHEREAS, Will Davis left a lasting imprint on the Lone Star
 State through his outstanding contributions, and although he is
 deeply missed by those he left behind, they will continue to find
 inspiration in his irreproachable character and his dedication to
 his family, his faith, and his fellow citizens; now, therefore, be
 it
 RESOLVED, That the 85th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the memory of Will David Davis Sr. and extend
 sincere sympathy to his loved ones; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Will David Davis Sr.
 Smithee
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 68 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 16, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 68 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on March 21, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor