Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR69 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.C.R. No. 69


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Words cannot adequately express the sorrow felt at
 the loss of Brenda Nation of Austin, who died on January 22, 2017,
 at the age of 59; and
 WHEREAS, Brenda Nation was born to Benjamin and Juanita
 Nation on October 4, 1957, and she grew up in Lake Charles,
 Louisiana; after graduating from LaGrange High School, she worked
 in a number of offices, including a law firm, where the attorneys
 urged her to attend college; she took their advice and earned a
 bachelor's degree from McNeese State University, and, in 1993, she
 received her law degree from Louisiana State University; and
 WHEREAS, Ms. Nation began her legal career as an assistant
 attorney general for the state of Louisiana, and in December 2001,
 she joined the staff of the American Council of Life Insurers;
 working first out of their headquarters in Washington, D.C., and
 then as regional vice president in the Austin office, she capably
 represented the ACLI before the legislatures of Texas, Oklahoma,
 Wyoming, New Mexico, and Alaska; and
 WHEREAS, At her 20th high school reunion, Ms. Nation
 reconnected with an old classmate, Allen Corder; the couple married
 three months later and went on to share more than two decades
 together; and
 WHEREAS, Ms. Nation won the admiration of many with her
 thoughtful and generous gifts, her skill as a scratch golfer, and
 her flair for decorating; she also loved to cook and entertain, and
 she delighted guests with her Cajun recipes, one of which was
 featured in Good Housekeeping magazine; and
 WHEREAS, A loving wife, a dedicated professional, and a loyal
 friend, Brenda Nation lived a full and generous life, and memories
 of her warmth, kindness, and joie de vivre will forever be treasured
 by all those who knew and loved her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 85th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Brenda Nation and extend heartfelt
 sympathy to the members of her family: to her husband, Allen Corder;
 to her brothers, Glenn Nation and his wife, Helen, and Dean Nation
 and his wife, Connie; and to her other relatives and many friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family, and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Brenda Nation.
 Smithee
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 69 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 16, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 69 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on March 22, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor