Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR100 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kuempel, Gutierrez (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.J.R. No. 100
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment on professional sports team
 charitable foundations conducting charitable raffles.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 47(d-1), Article III, Texas
 Constitution, is amended to read as follows:
 (d-1)  The legislature by general law may permit a
 professional sports team charitable foundation to conduct
 charitable raffles under the terms and conditions imposed by
 general law. The law may authorize the charitable foundation to pay
 with the raffle proceeds reasonable advertising, promotional, and
 administrative expenses. A law enacted under this subsection
 applies [may apply] only to an entity [that is] defined as a
 professional sports team charitable foundation under that law [on
 January 1, 2016,] and may only allow charitable raffles to be
 conducted at games hosted at the home venue of the professional
 sports team associated with a professional sports team charitable
 foundation.  In this subsection, "professional sports team" means:
 (1)  a team organized in this state that is a member of
 Major League Baseball, the National Basketball Association, the
 National Hockey League, the National Football League, Major League
 Soccer, the American Hockey League, the East Coast Hockey League,
 the American Association of Independent Professional Baseball, the
 Atlantic League of Professional Baseball, Minor League Baseball,
 the National Basketball Association Development League, the
 National Women's Soccer League, the Major Arena Soccer League, the
 United Soccer League, or the Women's National Basketball
 Association;
 (2)  a person hosting a motorsports racing team event
 sanctioned by the National Association for Stock Car Auto Racing
 (NASCAR), INDYCar, or another nationally recognized motorsports
 racing association at a venue in this state with a permanent seating
 capacity of not less than 75,000;
 (3)  an organization hosting a Professional Golf
 Association event; or
 (4)  any other professional sports team defined by law.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2017.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment on professional sports
 team charitable foundations conducting charitable raffles."
 * * * * *