Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1037 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/02/2017

                    H.R. No. 1037


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends are mourning the loss of Jack
 Lewis Walker Jr. of Nacogdoches, who passed away on January 7, 2017,
 at the age of 69; and
 WHEREAS, Born on November 21, 1947, in San Antonio, Jackie
 Walker was raised in Douglass by his grandparents, Farris and Faye
 Walker; after graduating from Douglass High School in 1966, he
 served his country in Vietnam as part of the U.S. Army 196th Light
 Infantry Brigade, earning a Bronze Star Medal for valor; he later
 attended Stephen F. Austin State University and went on to
 establish his own business, Venture Construction Company, where he
 enjoyed a successful 35-year career; and
 WHEREAS, Active in his community, Mr. Walker was a member of
 the Nacogdoches Veterans of Foreign Wars post, the Cushing Masonic
 Lodge, and the 196th Organization; he was also a valued congregant
 of Redeemer Lutheran Church; in his spare time, he enjoyed hunting,
 gardening, and cultivating wildflowers; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Walker married the love of his life, the former
 Mary Beth Hash, at a ceremony held in Longview on March 5, 1975; in
 the course of a rewarding marriage that spanned 41 years, they
 became the proud parents of a son, Shawn; and
 WHEREAS, Although Jackie Walker will be deeply missed, those
 who held him dear will forever remember the warmth and kindness he
 brought into their lives; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Jack Lewis Walker
 Jr. and extend sincere condolences to his many relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Jackie
 Walker.
 Clardy
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 1037 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 30, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House