Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR17 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/16/2017

                    H.R. No. 17


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A life filled with heroic service and meaningful
 accomplishments drew to a close with the passing of Joseph Ray Perry
 of Paint Creek on April 27, 2017, at the age of 92; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Hoyt Perry and Thelma Dinsmore Perry, Ray
 Perry was born in the Paint Creek community on April 23, 1925; he
 was educated at the Post School and in the Paint Creek Independent
 School District, which his grandfather, Wayne Perry, helped
 establish while Ray was growing up; with his country at war at the
 time of his graduation in 1943, he joined the U.S. Army Air Corps,
 and while still a teenager, he accepted the perilous assignment of
 being the tail gunner on a B-17 bomber; he ultimately completed 35
 combat missions over Nazi Germany, including one in which his
 crew's heavily damaged plane barely made it back to its base in
 England, and he was awarded a number of medals for his valorous
 service; and
 WHEREAS, After demobilization, Mr. Perry returned to Haskell
 County and soon had the good fortune to meet Amelia June Holt on a
 blind date; the couple married on June 29, 1947, beginning a
 rewarding marriage that would span almost 70 years; they settled in
 Paint Creek and worked as tenant farmers until they were able to
 purchase their own property, and Mr. Perry's deep love of farming
 and the land where he lived and worked were essential touchstones in
 his life; and
 WHEREAS, The Perrys became the parents of two children, Milla
 Perry Jones and James Richard "Rick" Perry; Mr. Perry took great
 pride in the accomplishments of his children, including his son,
 who was inspired by his father's example to become an officer in the
 U.S. Air Force and whose career in public office has included
 service as the Texas commissioner of agriculture and lieutenant
 governor, as the state's longest-serving governor, and as the
 United States secretary of energy; and
 WHEREAS, A prominent member of his community, Ray Perry
 served for a decade on the Paint Creek ISD school board, and in
 1968, he was first elected as a county commissioner; he held that
 office for 28 years, and his achievements made a lasting and
 positive difference in the lives of his fellow citizens; he also
 distinguished himself during his six-year tenure on the West
 Central Texas Council of Governments, which included two years as
 the president of the board; moreover, he was a member and two-time
 president of the Paint Creek Water Corporation board, after having
 played an instrumental role in the corporation's founding; and
 WHEREAS, In the 1990s, Mr. Perry retired, and he spent his
 time enjoying the love and laughter of his grandchildren and his
 great-grandchildren; through the years, he was an avid hunter, and
 a highlight of his hunting excursions was a trip to Alaska on which
 he shot a world record caribou; and
 WHEREAS, Ray Perry was a courageous airman, a caring husband
 and father, and a respected community leader, and the contributions
 he made in each of these roles will long inspire those who were
 fortunate enough to know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 85th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Joseph Ray Perry and
 extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Amelia Perry; to his children, Milla Perry Jones and James
 Richard "Rick" Perry and his wife, Anita; to his grandchildren,
 Griffin Perry and his wife, Meredith, Caitlyn Jones, and Sydney
 Perry Harrison and her husband, Brett; to his great-granddaughters,
 Ella and Piper Perry; to his brothers, Gene Perry and Don Perry and
 his wife, Nanette; to his sister, Frances Blacklock; to his nieces
 and nephews; and to his other relatives and many friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Joseph Ray
 Perry.
 Straus
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 17 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on May 12, 2017.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House