S.B. No. 1021 AN ACT relating to reports on the consolidation and certain functions of the health and human services system, including advisory committees within the system, and the re-creation of the Texas system of care framework. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 531.0051(c), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (c) The council is composed of: (1) the executive commissioner; (2) the director of each division established by the executive commissioner under Section 531.008(c); (3) the commissioner of a health and human services agency; [and] (4) the commissioner of the Department of Family and Protective Services, regardless of whether that agency continues as a state agency separate from the commission; and (5) other individuals appointed by the executive commissioner as the executive commissioner determines necessary. SECTION 2. Sections 531.02031(a) and (b), Government Code, are amended to read as follows: (a) Not later than July 31 [September 1], 2018, the executive commissioner shall conduct a study and submit a report and recommendations [recommendation] to the Health and Human Services Transition Legislative Oversight Committee that include: (1) a recommendation regarding the need to continue the Department of Family and Protective Services as a state agency separate from the commission, unless a determination on the continuation is made before that date; (2) a recommendation regarding the need to continue [and] the Department of State Health Services as a state agency [agencies] separate from the commission; (3) an assessment of the quality and consistency of data sharing, communication, and coordination between the Department of Family and Protective Services and the commission; and (4) an assessment of any known or potential conflicts of interest concerning licensing and regulation activities by the Department of Family and Protective Services or the commission, including the process by which known conflicts of interest are mitigated or managed by those agencies. (b) Not later than December 1, 2018, the Health and Human Services Transition Legislative Oversight Committee shall review the report and recommendations [recommendation] submitted under Subsection (a) and submit a report and recommendations [recommendation] to the legislature that include: (1) a recommendation regarding the need to continue the Department of Family and Protective Services as a state agency separate from the commission, unless a determination on the continuation is made before that date; (2) a recommendation regarding the need to continue [and] the Department of State Health Services as a state agency [agencies] separate from the commission; and (3) an assessment of and any necessary recommendations concerning data sharing, communication, and coordination between the Department of Family and Protective Services and the commission. SECTION 3. Section 531.251, Government Code, is reenacted to read as follows: Sec. 531.251. TEXAS SYSTEM OF CARE FRAMEWORK. (a) In this section: (1) "Minor" means an individual younger than 18 years of age. (2) "Serious emotional disturbance" means a mental, behavioral, or emotional disorder of sufficient duration to result in functional impairment that substantially interferes with or limits a person's role or ability to function in family, school, or community activities. (3) "System of care framework" means a framework for collaboration among state agencies, minors who have a serious emotional disturbance or are at risk of developing a serious emotional disturbance, and the families of those minors that improves access to services and delivers effective community-based services that are family-driven, youth- or young adult-guided, and culturally and linguistically competent. (b) The commission shall implement a system of care framework to develop local mental health systems of care in communities for minors who are receiving residential mental health services and supports or inpatient mental health hospitalization, have or are at risk of developing a serious emotional disturbance, or are at risk of being removed from the minor's home and placed in a more restrictive environment to receive mental health services and supports, including an inpatient mental health hospital, a residential treatment facility, or a facility or program operated by the Department of Family and Protective Services or an agency that is part of the juvenile justice system. (c) The commission shall: (1) maintain a comprehensive plan for the delivery of mental health services and supports to a minor and a minor's family using a system of care framework, including best practices in the financing, administration, governance, and delivery of those services; (2) enter memoranda of understanding with the Department of State Health Services, the Department of Family and Protective Services, the Texas Education Agency, the Texas Juvenile Justice Department, and the Texas Correctional Office on Offenders with Medical or Mental Impairments that specify the roles and responsibilities of each agency in implementing the comprehensive plan described by Subdivision (1); (3) identify appropriate local, state, and federal funding sources to finance infrastructure and mental health services and supports needed to support state and local system of care framework efforts; (4) develop an evaluation system to measure cross-system performance and outcomes of state and local system of care framework efforts; and (5) in implementing the provisions of this section, consult with stakeholders, including: (A) minors who have or are at risk of developing a serious emotional disturbance or young adults who received mental health services and supports as a minor with or at risk of developing a serious emotional disturbance; and (B) family members of those minors or young adults. SECTION 4. Not later than July 31, 2018, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall submit to the Health and Human Services Transition Legislative Oversight Committee the report required by Section 531.02031(a), Government Code, as amended by this Act. The report must also include: (1) the latest information available on the commission's progress in transferring and consolidating the administrative support services functions of the health and human services system as mandated by Subchapter A-1, Chapter 531, Government Code; and (2) recommendations on: (A) whether to abolish each statutory advisory committee that considers issues related to the health and human services system; and (B) for an advisory committee for which abolishment is recommended, whether to reestablish the advisory committee by rule, consolidate the advisory committee with another advisory committee, or permanently discontinue the advisory committee in any form. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1021 passed the Senate on May 3, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1021 passed the House on May 21, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor