Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1024 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 1024
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2017; March 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 23, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 23, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1024 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of certain lighting equipment on emergency
 management or airport security vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 547.305, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (e-1) to read as follows:
 (e-1)  An emergency management or airport security vehicle
 may be equipped with flashing blue and amber lights visible from
 directly in front of the center of the vehicle.  In this subsection,
 "emergency management or airport security vehicle" means a motor
 vehicle that:
 (1)  is owned or leased by a joint board created under
 Section 22.074; and
 (2)  has been designated or authorized by the joint
 board.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *