Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1024 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1024


 AN ACT
 relating to the use of certain lighting equipment on airport
 security vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 22, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 22.091 to read as follows:
 Sec. 22.091.  AIRPORT SECURITY VEHICLES.  (a)  In this
 section, "airport security vehicle" means a motor vehicle that:
 (1)  is owned or leased by a joint board; and
 (2)  has been designated or authorized by the joint
 board.
 (b)  An airport security vehicle may be equipped with
 flashing blue and amber lights visible from directly in front of the
 center of the vehicle.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1024 passed the Senate on
 April 3, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1024 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor