Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1083 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/29/2017

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 1083
 (In the Senate - Filed February 24, 2017; March 7, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 March 29, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 14, Nays 0; March 29, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1083 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the applicability of the sales and use tax to certain
 insurance services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 151.0039(b), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  "Insurance service" does not include:
 (1)  insurance coverage for which a premium is paid or
 commissions paid to insurance agents for the sale of insurance or
 annuities; [or]
 (2)  a service performed on behalf of an insured by a
 person licensed under Chapter 4102, Insurance Code; or
 (3)  a service performed by a certified public
 accountancy firm, as that term is defined by Section 901.002,
 Occupations Code, or on behalf of the firm by an owner, employee, or
 affiliate of the firm, if less than one percent of the firm's total
 revenue in the prior calendar year is from services in this state
 that would otherwise constitute insurance service under Subsection
 (a).
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect tax liability accruing before the effective date of this
 Act. That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been
 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
 the liability for those taxes.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2018.
 * * * * *