Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1117 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 1117
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2017; March 7, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 12, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 May 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1117 By:  Garcia


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the offense of failure to comply with an order from a
 fire marshal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 352.022, Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 352.022.  PENALTY FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ORDER.
 (a)  A person [An owner or occupant] who is subject to an order
 issued under Section 352.016 commits an offense if that person
 fails to comply with the order. Each refusal to comply is a
 separate offense.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c) or (d), an [The]
 offense under this section is a Class C [B] misdemeanor.
 (c)  An offense under this section is a Class B misdemeanor
 if the commission of the offense results in:
 (1)  property damage in an amount of $200 or more; or
 (2)  bodily injury or death.
 (d)  If [unless] it is shown on the trial of the offense that
 the defendant has been previously convicted two or more times under
 this section, [in which event] the offense is a state jail felony.
 SECTION 2.  Section 352.022, Local Government Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to an offense committed on or
 after the effective date of this Act. An offense committed before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on
 the date the offense was committed, and the former law is continued
 in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this section, an
 offense was committed before the effective date of this Act if any
 element of the offense was committed before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *