Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1119 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/22/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1119


 AN ACT
 relating to an annual report on employment positions provided
 through the Texas college work-study program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 56.082, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 56.082.  ANNUAL [BIENNIAL] REPORT. [(a)]  Not later
 than January 1 of each [odd-numbered] year, the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board shall submit to the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and the standing legislative committees with primary jurisdiction
 over higher education and post on the coordinating board's Internet
 website a report on the Texas college work-study program. The
 report must include the total number of students employed through
 the program, disaggregated by:
 (1)  race, ethnicity, and gender;
 (2)  major and certificate or degree program;
 (3)  classification as a freshman, sophomore, junior,
 or senior or the equivalent;
 (4)  enrollment in a full course load or less than a
 full course load, as determined by the coordinating board;
 (5)  the employment position's location on or off
 campus; and
 (6) [(2)]  the employer's status as a for-profit or
 nonprofit entity.
 [(b)     Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board shall submit its initial report under
 that subsection not later than May 1, 2019.    This subsection expires
 September 1, 2019.]
 SECTION 2.  Not later than September 1, 2018, the Texas
 Higher Education Coordinating Board shall submit its initial report
 required under Section 56.082, Education Code, as amended by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1119 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 26, Nays 5.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1119 passed the House on
 May 19, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 6, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor