Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1122 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2017

                    By: Huffines, Hall, Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 1122
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2017; March 7, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 26, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 1; April 26, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1122 By:  Huffines


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to abolishing certain county boards of education, boards
 of county school trustees, and offices of county school
 superintendent.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  Each county board of education, board of
 county school trustees, and office of county school superintendent
 in a county with a population of 2.2 million or more and that is
 adjacent to a county with a population of more than 800,000 is
 abolished effective September 1, 2017.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2017, a dissolution
 committee shall be formed for each county board of education or
 board of county school trustees to be abolished as provided by
 Subsection (a) of this section.  The dissolution committee is
 responsible for all financial decisions for each county board of
 education or board of county school trustees abolished by this Act,
 including asset distribution and payment of all debt obligations.
 (c)  A dissolution committee required by this Act shall be
 appointed by the comptroller and include:
 (1)  one financial advisor;
 (2)  the superintendent of the participating component
 school district with the largest number of students in average
 daily attendance or the superintendent's designee;
 (3)  one certified public accountant;
 (4)  one auditor who holds a license or other
 professional credential; and
 (5)  one bond counsel who holds a license or other
 professional credential.
 (d)  A dissolution committee created under this Act is
 subject to the open meetings requirements under Chapter 551,
 Government Code, and public information requirements under Chapter
 552, Government Code.
 (e)  Members of a dissolution committee may not receive
 compensation but are entitled to reimbursement for actual and
 necessary expenses incurred in performing the functions of the
 dissolution committee.
 (f)  Subject to the other requirements of this Act, the
 dissolution committee shall determine the manner in which all
 assets, liabilities, contracts, and services of the county board of
 education or board of county school trustees abolished by this Act
 are divided, transferred, or discontinued.  The dissolution
 committee shall create a sinking fund to deposit all money received
 in the abolishment of each county board of education or board of
 county school trustees for the payment of all debts of the county
 board of education or board of county school trustees.
 (g)  The dissolution committee shall continue providing
 transportation services to participating component school
 districts for the 2017-2018 school year.  The dissolution committee
 shall maintain current operations and personnel needed to provide
 the transportation services.
 (h)  At the end of the 2017-2018 school year all school
 buses, vehicles, and bus service centers shall be transferred to
 participating component school districts in proportionate shares
 equal to the proportion that the membership in each district bears
 to total membership in the county as of September 1, 2018, at no
 cost to the districts.
 (i)  The dissolution committee may employ for the 2017-2018
 school year one person to assist in the abolishment of the county
 board of education or board of county school trustees.
 (j)  On September 1, 2017, the participating component
 school district with the largest number of students in average
 daily attendance has the right of first refusal to buy, at fair
 market value, the administrative building of the county board of
 education or board of county school trustees.
 (k)  An ad valorem tax assessed by a county board of
 education or board of county school trustees shall continue to be
 assessed by the county on behalf of the board for the purpose of
 paying the principal of and interest on any bonds issued by the
 county board of education or board of county school trustees until
 all bonds are paid in full.  This subsection applies only to a bond
 issued before the effective date of this Act for which the tax
 receipts were obligated.  On payment of all bonds issued by the
 county board of education or board of county school trustees the ad
 valorem tax may not be assessed.
 (l)  In the manner provided by rule of the commissioner of
 education, the county shall collect and use any delinquent taxes
 imposed by or on behalf of the county board of education or board of
 county school trustees.
 (m)  The dissolution committee shall distribute the assets
 remaining after discharge of the liabilities of the county board of
 education or board of county school trustees to the component
 school districts in the county in proportionate shares equal to the
 proportion that the membership in each district bears to total
 membership in the county as of September 1, 2017.  The dissolution
 committee shall liquidate board assets as necessary to discharge
 board liabilities and facilitate the distribution of assets. A
 person authorized by the dissolution committee shall execute any
 documents necessary to complete the transfer of assets,
 liabilities, or contracts.
 (n)  The dissolution committee shall encourage the component
 school districts to:
 (1)  continue sharing services received through the
 county board of education or board of county school trustees; and
 (2)  give preference to private sector contractors to
 continue services provided by the county board of education or
 board of county school trustees.
 (o)  The chief financial officer and financial advisor for
 the county board of education or board of county school trustees
 shall provide assistance to the dissolution committee in abolishing
 the county board of education or board of county school trustees.
 (p)  The Texas Education Agency shall provide assistance to a
 dissolution committee in the distribution of assets, liabilities,
 contracts, and services of a county board of education or board of
 county school trustees abolished by this Act.
 (q)  Any dissolution committee created as provided by this
 Act is abolished on the date all debt obligations of the county
 board of education or board of county school trustees are paid in
 full and all assets distributed to component school districts.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 266 (S.B. 394), Acts of the 40th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1927 (Article 2700a, Vernon's Texas
 Civil Statutes), is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *