Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1123 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/12/2017

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1123
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2017; March 7, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to conditions on the receipt of tuition and fee exemptions
 at public institutions of higher education for adopted students
 formerly in foster or other residential care.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.2001(g), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (g)  This section does not apply to:
 (1)  the waiver provided by Section 54.216 or any other
 reduction in tuition provided to a high school student for
 enrollment in a dual credit course or other course for which the
 student may earn joint high school and college credit;
 (2)  the exemption provided by Section
 54.341(a-2)(1)(A), (B), (C), or (D) or (b)(1)(A), (B), (C), or (D);
 (3)  the exemption provided by Section 54.342, [or]
 54.366, or 54.367; or
 (4)  any provision of this code that authorizes or
 requires the payment of tuition or fees at the rates provided for
 residents of this state by a person who is not a resident of this
 state for purposes of Subchapter B.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *