Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1124 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/22/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1124


 AN ACT
 relating to the administrative attachment of the Texas Forensic
 Science Commission to the Office of Court Administration of the
 Texas Judicial System.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 9, Article 38.01, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 9.  ADMINISTRATIVE ATTACHMENT TO OFFICE OF COURT
 ADMINISTRATION [SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY]. (a)  The
 commission is administratively attached to the Office of Court
 Administration of the Texas Judicial System [Sam Houston State
 University].
 (b)  The Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial
 System [Board of Regents of the Texas State University System]
 shall provide administrative support to the commission as necessary
 to enable the commission to carry out the purposes of this article.
 (c)  Only the commission may exercise the duties of the
 commission under this article.  Except as provided by Subsection
 (b), the Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial
 System does not have [neither the Board of Regents of the Texas
 State University System nor Sam Houston State University has] any
 authority or responsibility with respect to the duties of the
 commission under this article.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, Sam Houston State University and the Office of Court
 Administration of the Texas Judicial System shall adopt a
 memorandum of understanding to provide for the transfer of the
 administrative attachment of the Texas Forensic Science Commission
 to the office, including any necessary transfer of employees,
 records, equipment, and supplies.  The memorandum of understanding
 must provide for the transfer to be completed not later than
 December 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1124 passed the Senate on
 March 22, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1124 passed the House on
 May 21, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 141, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor