Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1126 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2017

                    By: Hall S.B. No. 1126
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2017; March 7, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 20, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 352 as the
 Staff Sergeant Jeremie S. Border Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.123.  STAFF SERGEANT JEREMIE S. BORDER MEMORIAL
 HIGHWAY. (a)  The portion of State Highway 352 in the municipal
 limits of Mesquite is designated as the Staff Sergeant Jeremie S.
 Border Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Staff Sergeant Jeremie S. Border Memorial
 Highway and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *