Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1148 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1148


 AN ACT
 relating to maintenance of certification by a physician or an
 applicant for a license to practice medicine in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle F, Title 8, Insurance Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 1461 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 1461. DISCRIMINATION AGAINST PHYSICIAN BASED ON
 MAINTENANCE OF CERTIFICATION
 Sec. 1461.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Enrollee" means an individual who is eligible to
 receive health care services under a managed care plan.
 (2)  "Maintenance of certification" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 151.002, Occupations Code.
 (3)  "Managed care plan" means a health benefit plan
 under which health care services are provided to enrollees through
 contracts with physicians and that requires enrollees to use
 participating physicians or that provides a different level of
 coverage for enrollees who use participating physicians.  The term
 includes a health benefit plan issued by:
 (A)  a health maintenance organization;
 (B)  a preferred provider benefit plan issuer; or
 (C)  any other entity that issues a health benefit
 plan, including an insurance company.
 (4)  "Participating physician" means a physician who
 has directly or indirectly contracted with a health benefit plan
 issuer to provide services to enrollees.
 (5)  "Physician" means an individual licensed to
 practice medicine in this state.
 Sec. 1461.002.  APPLICABILITY. (a)  This chapter applies to
 a physician regardless of whether the physician is a participating
 physician.
 (b)  This chapter applies to a person with whom a managed
 care plan issuer contracts to:
 (1)  process or pay claims;
 (2)  obtain the services of physicians to provide
 health care services to enrollees; or
 (3)  issue verifications or preauthorizations.
 Sec. 1461.003.  DISCRIMINATION BASED ON MAINTENANCE OF
 CERTIFICATION. (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), a
 managed care plan issuer may not differentiate between physicians
 based on a physician's maintenance of certification in regard to:
 (1)  paying the physician;
 (2)  reimbursing the physician; or
 (3)  directly or indirectly contracting with the
 physician to provide services to enrollees.
 (b)  A managed care plan issuer may differentiate between
 physicians based on a physician's maintenance of certification only
 if the designation under law or certification or accreditation by a
 national certifying or accrediting organization of an entity
 described by Section 151.0515(a), Occupations Code, is contingent
 on the entity requiring a specific maintenance of certification by
 physicians seeking staff privileges or credentialing at the entity.
 SECTION 2.  Section 151.002(a), Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subdivision (6-b) to read as follows:
 (6-b)  "Maintenance of certification" means the
 satisfactory completion of periodic recertification requirements
 that are required for a physician to maintain certification after
 initial certification from:
 (A)  a medical specialty member board of the
 American Board of Medical Specialties;
 (B)  a medical specialty member board of the
 American Osteopathic Association Bureau of Osteopathic
 Specialists;
 (C)  the American Board of Oral and Maxillofacial
 Surgery; or
 (D)  any other certifying board that is recognized
 by the Texas Medical Board.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter B, Chapter 151, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 151.0515 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.0515.  DISCRIMINATION BASED ON MAINTENANCE OF
 CERTIFICATION. (a)  Except as otherwise provided by this section,
 the following entities may not differentiate between physicians
 based on a physician's maintenance of certification:
 (1)  a health facility that is licensed under Subtitle
 B, Title 4, Health and Safety Code, or a mental hospital that is
 licensed under Chapter 577, Health and Safety Code, if the facility
 or hospital has an organized medical staff or a process for
 credentialing physicians;
 (2)  a hospital that is owned or operated by this state;
 (3)  an institution or program that is owned, operated,
 or licensed by this state, including an institution or program that
 directly or indirectly receives state financial assistance, if the
 institution or program:
 (A)  has an organized medical staff or a process
 for credentialing physicians on its staff; and
 (B)  is not a medical school, as defined by
 Section 61.501, Education Code, or a comprehensive cancer center,
 as designated by the National Cancer Institute; or
 (4)  an institution or program that is owned, operated,
 or licensed by a political subdivision of this state, if the
 institution or program has an organized medical staff or a process
 for credentialing physicians on its staff.
 (b)  An entity described by Subsection (a) may differentiate
 between physicians based on a physician's maintenance of
 certification if:
 (1)  the entity's designation under law or
 certification or accreditation by a national certifying or
 accrediting organization is contingent on the entity requiring a
 specific maintenance of certification by physicians seeking staff
 privileges or credentialing at the entity; and
 (2)  the differentiation is limited to those physicians
 whose maintenance of certification is required for the entity's
 designation, certification, or accreditation as described by
 Subdivision (1).
 (c)  An entity described by Subsection (a) may differentiate
 between physicians based on a physician's maintenance of
 certification if the voting physician members of the entity's
 organized medical staff vote to authorize the differentiation.
 (d)  An authorization described by Subsection (c) may:
 (1)  be made only by the voting physician members of the
 entity's organized medical staff and not by the entity's governing
 body, administration, or any other person;
 (2)  subject to Subsection (e), establish terms
 applicable to the entity's differentiation, including:
 (A)  appropriate grandfathering provisions; and
 (B)  limiting the differentiation to certain
 medical specialties; and
 (3)  be rescinded at any time by a vote of the voting
 physician members of the entity's organized medical staff.
 (e)  Terms established under Subsection (d)(2) may not
 conflict with a maintenance of certification requirement
 applicable to the entity's designation under law or certification
 or accreditation by a national certifying or accrediting
 organization.
 SECTION 4.  Section 155.003, Occupations Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsection (d-1) to read as
 follows:
 (d)  Except as provided by Subsection (d-1), in [In] addition
 to the other requirements prescribed by this subtitle, the board
 may require an applicant to comply with other requirements that the
 board considers appropriate.
 (d-1)  The board may not require maintenance of
 certification by an applicant for the applicant to be eligible for a
 license under this chapter.
 SECTION 5.  Section 156.001, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  The board may not adopt a rule requiring maintenance of
 certification by a license holder for the license holder to be
 eligible for an initial or renewal registration permit.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2018.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1148 passed the Senate on
 April 27, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 25, 2017, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2017, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2017, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 30,
 Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1148 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 140,
 Nays 4, one present not voting; May 26, 2017, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2017, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 2, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor