By: Menéndez, et al. S.B. No. 1152 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2017; March 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs & Border Security; April 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 18, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to excused absences from public school for the purpose of pursuing enlistment in a branch of the armed services of the United States or the Texas National Guard. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 25.087, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsections (b-5) and (b-6) and amending Subsection (d) to read as follows: (b-5) A school district shall excuse a student who is 17 years of age or older from attending school to pursue enlistment in a branch of the armed services of the United States or the Texas National Guard, provided that: (1) the district may not excuse for this purpose more than four days of school during the period the student is enrolled in high school; and (2) the district verifies the student's activities related to pursuing enlistment in a branch of the armed services or the Texas National Guard. (b-6) Each school district shall adopt procedures to verify a student's activities as described by Subsection (b-5). (d) A student whose absence is excused under Subsection (b), (b-1), (b-2), (b-4), (b-5), or (c) may not be penalized for that absence and shall be counted as if the student attended school for purposes of calculating the average daily attendance of students in the school district. A student whose absence is excused under Subsection (b), (b-1), (b-2), (b-4), (b-5), or (c) shall be allowed a reasonable time to make up school work missed on those days. If the student satisfactorily completes the school work, the day of absence shall be counted as a day of compulsory attendance. SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018 school year. SECTION 3. Not later than October 1, 2017, each school district shall adopt a policy for verification of student activities relating to pursuing military enlistment as required by Section 25.087(b-6), Education Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *